Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Effective date 8/1/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 491.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 69, nays 21. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 22 yeas and 14 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2018
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
House conferees appointed: Bishop, Mack, and Stefanski.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Martiny, Gary Smith, and Donahue.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
House committee amendments rejected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and failed to be concurred in by a vote of 18 yeas and 12 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 18. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2018
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
Reported with amendments (10-3). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 17 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 4 for March 27, 2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2018
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2018
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|