The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Sharon F. Lyles. DIGEST SB 20 Original 2018 Regular Session Cortez Present law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Transportation and Development and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2017, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2018, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Transportation and Development and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2018, in accordance with the "Sunset" law. Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the "Sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2021, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2020, unless the department is re-created again. Effective June 30, 2018. (Adds R.S. 49:191(9)(g); repeals R.S. 49:191(7))