Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Effective date 5/31/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 577.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 84, nays 5. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
House conferees appointed: Dustin Miller, Hoffmann, and Carmody.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, Peterson, and Mills.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 25 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 20. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Reported with amendments (7-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2018
|
Reported with amendments (8-3). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|