LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2018 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB222
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB222
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2018 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB222
Action History
Senate
04/04/2018
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Senate
03/22/2018
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
Senate
03/21/2018
Reported with amendments.
Senate
03/12/2018
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
Senate
03/01/2018
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.