House
|
05/18/2018
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Boudreaux, and Mills.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 31. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Motion to reconsider called from the table.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2018
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Reported with amendments (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|