Senate | 04/10/2018 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 12 yeas and 24 nays. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2018 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2018 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2018 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |