Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Effective date 8/1/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 219.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2018
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2018
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2018
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|