Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Effective date 5/23/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 469.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 42. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Reported favorably (10-4-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 14 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|