Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Effective date 8/1/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 221.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2018
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2018
|
Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|