Senate
|
06/01/2018
|
Effective date 8/1/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 665.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|