House | 04/16/2018 | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/13/2018 | Reported with amendments (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/06/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | ||
House | 04/05/2018 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2018 | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2018 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2018 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2018 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |