House
|
05/03/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 17 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 14 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|