House | 04/11/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 04/10/2018 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2018 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2018 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2018 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |