House | 05/11/2018 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/03/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18. | ||
House | 05/02/2018 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/01/2018 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | ||
House | 04/30/2018 | Reported favorably (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | ||
House | 04/18/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/17/2018 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 8 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2018 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2018 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2018 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |