Senate
|
05/11/2018
|
Effective date 5/11/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 143.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2018
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2018
|
Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2018
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2018
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|