House
|
05/18/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 18, nays 65. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2018
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|