Senate | 04/19/2018 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 10 yeas and 25 nays. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2018 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2018 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |