Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Effective date 8/1/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 603.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 03 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Reported with amendments (18-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|