House | 04/13/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2018 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 11 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2018 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2018 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |