Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Effective date 5/25/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 488.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2018
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2018
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2018
|
Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|