Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Effective date 8/1/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 574.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/23/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House. (Received on 05/22/18.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2018
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2018
|
Reported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|