House | 04/24/2018 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2018 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2018 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |