Louisiana 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB65 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version

                            SLS 18RS-213	ENGROSSED
2018 Regular Session
SENATE BILL NO. 65
BY SENATOR JOHNS 
TAX/TAXATION.  Provides for incentive rebates under the Quality Jobs Program. (gov sig)
1	AN ACT
2 To amend and reenact R.S. 51:2455(D)(3), relative to Quality Jobs incentive rebates; to
3 change the application period for certain incentive rebates; to provide for an effective
4 date; and to provide for related matters.
5 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
6 Section 1.  R.S. 51:2455(D)(3) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:
7 ยง2455. Incentive rebates
8	*          *          *
9	D.(1) *          *          *
10	(3) Applications shall be filed no later than twenty-four months after the
11 filing of the advance notification, except for advances as follows:
12	(a) For advance notifications filed on or after January 1, 2014, and before
13 January 31, 2014, applications may be filed at any time prior to January 31, 2016.
14	(b) For advance notifications filed on or after June 1, 2015, and before
15 July 1, 2015, applications may be filed at any time before January 1, 2018.
16	*          *          *
17 Section 2. This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not
Page 1 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 65
SLS 18RS-213	ENGROSSED
1 signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature
2 by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana. If
3 vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become
4 effective on the day following such approval.
5 Section 3. In the event a conflict between this Act and the provisions of Section 3 of
6 Act No. 126 of the 2015 Regular Session of the Legislature, the provisions of this Act shall
7 supercede and control.
The original instrument was prepared by Leonore F. Heavey. The following
digest, which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was
prepared by James Benton.
DIGEST
SB 65 Engrossed 2018 Regular Session	Johns
Present law requires that applications for La. Quality Jobs Program incentives be filed no
later than 24 months after the filing of the advance notification.
Proposed law retains present law. 
Present law provides an exception to the application filing requirement for projects for which
an advance notification form was filed on or after January 1, 2014, and before January 31,
2014, and authorized applications for those projects to be filed any time prior to January 31,
2016.
Proposed law authorizes an exception to the application filing requirement for projects for
which an advance notification was filed on or after June 1, 2015, and before July 1, 2015,
and requires applications for those projects to be filed before January 1, 2018.
Effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action.
(Amends R.S. 51:2455(D)(3))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Revenue and Fiscal
Affairs to the original bill
1. Makes technical changes.
2. Changes effective date to governor's signature.
Page 2 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.