Louisiana 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB84 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                            SLS 18RS-337	ORIGINAL
2018 Regular Session
SENATE BILL NO. 84
BY SENATOR WALSWORTH 
JUVENILE JUSTICE.  Changes the effective date of the definition of "child".  (6/1/18)
1	AN ACT
2 To amend and reenact Children's Code Article 804(1)(b), relative to juveniles; to change the
3 effective date of the definition of child; and to provide for related matters.
4 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
5 Section 1. Children's Code Article 804(1)(b) is hereby amended and reenacted to read
6 as follows:
7 Art. 804. Definitions
8 As used in this Title:
9	(1)(a) *          *          *
10	(b) After June 30, 2018 2019, "child" means any person under the age of
11 twenty-one, including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act on or
12 after July 1, 2018 2019, when the act is not a crime of violence as defined in R.S.
13 14:2, and occurs before the person attains eighteen years of age.
14	*          *          *
15 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on June 1, 2018.
Page 1 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 84
SLS 18RS-337	ORIGINAL
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Ashley Menou.
DIGEST
SB 84 Original	2018 Regular Session	Walsworth
Present law defines "child" as any person under the age of 21, including an emancipated
minor, who commits a delinquent act before attaining 17 years of age.
Present law provides that after June 30, 2018, "child" shall mean any person under the age
of 21, including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act on or after July 1,
2018, when the act is not a crime of violence as defined in R.S. 14:2, and occurs before the
person attains 18 years of age.
Proposed law changes the effective date of present law to provide that after June 30, 2019,
"child" shall mean any person under the age of 21, including an emancipated minor, who
commits a delinquent act on or after July 1, 2019, when the act is not a crime of violence as
defined in R.S. 14:2, and occurs before the person attains 18 years of age.
Effective June 1, 2018.
(Amends Ch.C. Art 804(1)(b))
Page 2 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.