Senate | 05/18/2018 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. | ||
House | 05/18/2018 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/17/2018 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 87 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/16/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. | ||
House | 05/16/2018 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/15/2018 | Reported favorably (8-0). | ||
House | 05/10/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/09/2018 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 24 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |