Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2018
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2018
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 82 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2018
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2018
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2018
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|