Senate | 05/17/2018 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/14/2018 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2018 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2018 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/11/2018 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 80 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/03/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18. | ||
House | 04/30/2018 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/27/2018 | Reported favorably (12-0). | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2018 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2018 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |