House | 05/18/2018 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 28, nays 55. The resolution was rejected. | ||
House | 05/18/2018 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/17/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/18. | ||
House | 05/17/2018 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/17/2018 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/16/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. | ||
House | 05/16/2018 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/15/2018 | Reported with amendments (5-3). | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2018 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2018 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |