Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2018
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 90 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2018
|
Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Reported favorably (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2018
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2018
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|