Senate | 04/10/2018 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 04/09/2018 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 04/05/2018 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2018 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |