Senate | 05/07/2018 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/01/2018 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 04/27/2018 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 83 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 04/19/2018 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/18. | ||
House | 04/13/2018 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | Reported favorably (9-0). | ||
House | 04/05/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |