House | 05/10/2018 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 05/09/2018 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2018 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |