Senate | 05/17/2018 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2018 | Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2018 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |