Senate | 05/17/2018 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2018 | Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2018 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2018 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |