Louisiana 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR6

Introduced
3/12/18  
Introduced
3/12/18  
Passed
3/13/18  

Caption

Expresses condolences upon the death of William "Billy" Patout III.

Impact

While SR6 does not propose any changes to state law, it embodies the legislative recognition of individual contributions to the state’s agriculture. The resolution commemorates the impact that industry leaders like Patout have on community identity and economic stability, thus reinforcing the value of honoring such figures in the legislative process. The acknowledgment of Patout's work reflects the ongoing importance of the sugar industry to the economies of Southern states, particularly Louisiana.

Summary

Senate Resolution No. 6, introduced by Senator Allain, serves to express the condolences of the Louisiana Senate upon the passing of William 'Billy' Schwing Patout III. A significant figure in the sugar cane industry, Patout's contributions were vital to not only the economic development of South Louisiana but also to the cultural heritage associated with sugar production in the region. His lifetime commitment to the industry is highlighted in this resolution, marking it as a moment of remembrance and respect for his legacy.

Sentiment

The resolution encapsulates a positive and respectful sentiment towards an individual who played a pivotal role in the sugar industry. The statement signifies unity and recognition within the Senate, showcasing a collective gratitude for the contributions Patout made. This highlights a general sentiment of appreciation for local businesses and their leaders and underscores the human element often present in legislative conversations, fostering a sense of community and shared history.

Contention

As a resolution, SR6 lacks the contentious aspects often seen in traditional legislative bills, as it primarily serves an honorific purpose. However, the resolution does illuminate a broader dialogue surrounding the sugar industry in Louisiana, echoing the challenges and considerations faced by agricultural sectors in terms of technological advancement, economic resilience, and community tradition. Although no opposition is noted, the resolution opens a reflection on how the sustainability and innovation in such traditional industries are vital for future generations.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR12

Recognizes Tuesday, March 19, 2024, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA HB330

Creates the Industrial Hemp Promotion and Research Program (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

LA HB531

Provides for the Louisiana Department of Economic Development to establish and administer the Louisiana Industrial Product Certification Program (RE +$202,029 SG EX See Note)

LA HR86

Recognizes May 7, 2013, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day

LA SR67

Declares May 5, 2010, as "Louisiana Chemical Industry Day" in Louisiana.

LA HR37

Designates March 19, 2024, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day at the state capitol

LA HR117

Recognizes Tuesday, May 6, 2014, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day

LA SR83

Designates May 9, 2017, as Louisiana Chemical Industry Day.