House
|
05/24/2019
|
Effective date: 08/01/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 5.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Reported favorably (8-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2019
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|