Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 12 yeas and 22 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Reported with amendments (8-7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|