Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|