House | 05/28/2019 | Notice removed | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19. | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19. | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Reported with amendments (9-2). | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Prefiled. |