House | 04/25/2019 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 40, nays 45. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/19. | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Reported with amendments (6-0). | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Prefiled. |