House
|
06/05/2019
|
Effective date: 06/05/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 115.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2019
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Reported with amendments (7-6).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Discharged from the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|