House
|
06/28/2019
|
Becomes Act No. 444.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 4. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/02/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 12. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Reported without amendments (6-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Reported with amendments (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|