Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Reported favorably (6-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|