House | 05/16/2019 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19. | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Reported with amendments (6-0). | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Reported favorably (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Prefiled. |