Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Reported favorably (17-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|