Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 9. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported favorably (14-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|