House
|
07/30/2019
|
Effective date: 06/20/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 416.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice the Senate discharged the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Discharged from Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, Mizell, and Appel.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
House conferees appointed: Jones, Pearson, and Bacala.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, the House refused to concur in the amendments proposed by the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Reported favorably (6-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2019
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|