Senate | 05/28/2019 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2019 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/19. | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Reported favorably (18-0). | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Prefiled. |