Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 17. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 27. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Reported with amendments (7-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Reported with amendments (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|