House
|
06/28/2019
|
Effective date: 06/28/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 30.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
House conferees appointed: Abramson, Jimmy Harris, and Stefanski.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Alario, LaFleur, and Morrell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0. The Senate amendments, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
By a vote of 88 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Called from the calendar, Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Reported with amendments (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|